PA SB1031 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sentence of total confinement; in licensing of drivers, further providing for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked and for ignition interlock limited license; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for ignition interlock.
Title
In sentencing, further providing for sentence of total confinement; in licensing of drivers, further providing for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked and for ignition interlock limited license; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for ignition interlock.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. James Brewster [D] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03531 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03531 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |