PA SB1031 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.789, No.285), known as The Insurance Department Act of 1921, in examinations, further providing for purpose and providing for scheduling conference, for budget estimate and revisions, for billing invoices and for annual examination and analysis report.
Title
In examinations, further providing for purpose and providing for scheduling conference, for budget estimate and revisions, for billing invoices and for annual examination and analysis report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1031 PN 1449, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2018-05-21 | House | In the House |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |