PA SB1024 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for duty of driver in construction and maintenance areas or on highway safety corridors.
Title
In rules of the road in general, further providing for duty of driver in construction and maintenance areas or on highway safety corridors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |