PA SB1021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2018-05-21SenateRemoved from table
2018-05-21SenateLaid on the table
2018-03-20SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-20SenateReported as committed
2018-01-24SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback