PA SB1021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.
Title
In veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-03-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |