PA SB1018 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 25 (Elections) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration system, further providing for SURE system; in voter registration, further providing for approval of registration applications; in changes in records, further providing for death of registrant; in provisions contingent on Federal law, further providing for removal of electors; and making a related repeal.
Title
In registration system, further providing for SURE system; in voter registration, further providing for approval of registration applications; in changes in records, further providing for death of registrant; in provisions contingent on Federal law, further providing for removal of electors; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A03835 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A03790 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A03790 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |