PA SB1018 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 26, 1947 (P.L.318, No.140), known as the CPA Law, further providing for definitions, for requirements for issuance of certificate, for certificates issued by domestic reciprocity, for licenses to practice, for licensing of firms and for peer review.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for requirements for issuance of certificate, for certificates issued by domestic reciprocity, for licenses to practice, for licensing of firms and for peer review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 1018 PN 1936, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1018 PN 1936, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1018 PN 1936, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | House | Act No. 157 |
2016-11-04 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2016-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-18 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-18 | House | Second consideration |
2016-10-17 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-28 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-07-07 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-07-01 | House | In the House |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |