PA SB1011 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for rights of victims of crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for rights of victims of crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1011 PN 1824, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1011 PN 1824, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07353 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1011 PN 1564, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1011 PN 1402, A6180, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-6180 (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenatePamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1
2018-06-22SenateFiled in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth
2018-06-22SenateSigned in House
2018-06-21SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (48-0)
2018-06-21SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-20SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2018-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-11HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-11HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-06HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-05HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-05HouseReported as amended
2018-03-26HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-03-21HouseIn the House
2018-03-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2018-03-20SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-03-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-01-31SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-31SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-30SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-30SenateReported as committed
2018-01-02SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1011
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1011&pn=1402
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1011&pn=1564
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1011&pn=1824
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=01/30/2018&RollCallId=645
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/19/2018&RollCallId=688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=423
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1589
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1775
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=586
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1031

Bill Comments

feedback