PA SB1006 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in consolidated county assessment, further providing for abstracts of building and demolition permits to be forwarded to the county assessment office.
Title
In consolidated county assessment, further providing for abstracts of building and demolition permits to be forwarded to the county assessment office.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1006 PN 1694, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-10-15 | House | In the House |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |