PA SB1006 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for Schedule I controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for Schedule I controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-15 - Senate - SB 1006 PN 1304, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - SB 1006 PN 1304, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - SB 1006 PN 1250, 2011 A2681, SWANGER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - SB 1006 PN 1120, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-23SenateAct No. 7
2011-06-23SenateApproved by the Governor
2011-06-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2011-06-16SenateSigned in House
2011-06-15SenateSigned in Senate
2011-06-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
2011-06-14SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2011-06-14SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2011-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2011-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2011-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2011-06-08HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-06-08HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2011-06-07HouseRemoved from table
2011-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2011-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2011-05-24HouseReported as amended
2011-05-11HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2011-05-10HouseIn the House
2011-05-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2011-05-09SenateRe-reported as committed
2011-05-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2011-05-04SenateSecond consideration
2011-05-03SenateFirst consideration
2011-05-03SenateReported as committed
2011-04-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1006
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1006&pn=1120
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1006&pn=1250
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1006&pn=1304
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=99
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=05/03/2011&rNbr=212
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/09/2011&rNbr=243
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=417
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/14/2011&rNbr=350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=167

Bill Comments

feedback