PA SB1002 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1041 over the Mahoning Creek in Grant Township and Canoe Township, Indiana County, as the Army SPC Christine L. Mayes Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 286 over the South Branch Cush Creek River, Montgomery Township, Indiana County, as the Sgt. Edward John Parada Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19108, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over the Two Lick Creek, Borough of Clymer, Indiana County, as the Corporal Louis R. Tate Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19109, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over the Two Lick Creek, at the east end of the Borough of Clymer, Indiana County, as the Lance Corporal Joshua T. Twigg Memorial Bridge; designating the portion of State Route 2024 and State Route 1016, also known as Monument Orviston Road, from the intersection of State Route 2024 and Main Street in Beech Creek Borough, Clinton County, to the intersection of State Route 1016 and Kato Orviston Road in Curtin Township, Centre County, as the CPL Milford H. Wensel Memorial Highway; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 44 in Potter County as the Highway to the Stars.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1041 over the Mahoning Creek in Grant Township and Canoe Township, Indiana County, as the Army SPC Christine L. Mayes Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 286 over the South Branch Cush Creek River, Montgomery Township, Indiana County, as the Sgt. Edward John Parada Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19108, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over the Two Lick Creek, Borough of Clymer, Indiana County, as the Corporal Louis R. Tate Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19109, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286 over the Two Lick Creek, at the east end of the Borough of Clymer, Indiana County, as the Lance Corporal Joshua T. Twigg Memorial Bridge; designating the portion of State Route 2024 and State Route 1016, also known as Monument Orviston Road, from the intersection of State Route 2024 and Main Street in Beech Creek Borough, Clinton County, to the intersection of State Route 1016 and Kato Orviston Road in Curtin Township, Centre County, as the CPL Milford H. Wensel Memorial Highway; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 44 in Potter County as the Highway to the Stars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1002 PN 1912, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1002 PN 1912, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1002 PN 1911, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 182 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1002 PN 1874, 2017 A7607, CAUSER (Y: 142 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07452 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07459 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07230 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1002 PN 1430, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1002 PN 1912, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 1002 PN 1911, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED (Y: 182 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1002 PN 1874, 2017 A7607, CAUSER (Y: 142 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07452 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07459 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07230 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1002 PN 1430, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 70 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-03-19 | House | In the House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |