PA SB1001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the declaration of a public health emergency, for duties of the Department of Health, for temporary regulations and for immunity from liability.
Title
Providing for the declaration of a public health emergency, for duties of the Department of Health, for temporary regulations and for immunity from liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1001 PN 1892, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2018-06-20 | House | In the House |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |