PA SB1001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the declaration of a public health emergency, for duties of the Department of Health, for temporary regulations and for immunity from liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the declaration of a public health emergency, for duties of the Department of Health, for temporary regulations and for immunity from liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1001 PN 1892, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-19SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-04SenateSecond consideration
2018-05-22SenateFirst consideration
2018-05-22SenateReported as amended
2018-04-18SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1001
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=1672
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=1775
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=1892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=848
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=978
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=572

Bill Comments

feedback