PA HR96 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing May 2, 2023, as "World Asthma Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing May 2, 2023, as "World Asthma Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to HEALTH |