PA HR96 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-30)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution urging the Secretary of the Navy to designate Philadelphia and both banks of the Delaware River as the site of the main celebration of the 250th birthdays of the United States Navy and the United States Marine Corps in October and November 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution urging the Secretary of the Navy to designate Philadelphia and both banks of the Delaware River as the site of the main celebration of the 250th birthdays of the United States Navy and the United States Marine Corps in October and November 2025.

Sponsors

Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Jake Wheatley [D]Rep. Craig Williams [R]
Rep. David Delloso [D]Rep. Joseph Webster [D]Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. Robert James [R]
Rep. Karen Boback [R]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D]Rep. Joe Hamm [R]
Rep. Todd Polinchock [R]Rep. Donald Cook [R]Rep. Lori Mizgorski [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]
Rep. Kristine Howard [D]Rep. Jerome Knowles [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Christina Sappey [D]
Rep. Eric Davanzo [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]
Rep. Robert Freeman [D]Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Mark Rozzi [D]
Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Ben Sanchez [D]Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]Rep. Craig Staats [R]
Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Mike Jones [R]Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. David Millard [R]
Rep. David Rowe [R]Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Jennifer O'Mara [D]Rep. Frank Burns [D]
Rep. Christopher Sainato [D]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]Rep. Dawn Keefer [R]Rep. Jim Cox [R]
Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]Rep. Dan Moul [R]Rep. Timothy O'Neal [R]Rep. Sara Innamorato [D]
Rep. Nancy Guenst [D]Rep. Stephanie Borowicz [R]Rep. Melissa Shusterman [D]Rep. Susan Helm [R]
Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. Michael Zabel [D]Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. Kate Klunk [R]
Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D]Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D]Rep. Stephen Samuelson [D]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]
Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Todd Stephens [R]Rep. Daryl Metcalfe [R]Rep. Rob Mercuri [R]
Rep. James Struzzi [R]Rep. Dianne Herrin [D]Rep. Milou Mackenzie [R]Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]
Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Mike Armanini [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]Rep. Robert Merski [D]
Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D]Rep. Joseph Hohenstein [D]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Mary Isaacson [D]
Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. James Rigby [R]Rep. Bradley Roae [R]Rep. Margo Davidson [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HR 96 PN 1391 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-06-08SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-08HouseAdopted (203-0)
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-04-27HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback