PA HR921 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing August 19, 2020, as "Aviation Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing August 19, 2020, as "Aviation Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Resolution As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |