PA HR9 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A Resolution designating February 16, 2009, as "Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania; and urging the National Institutes of Health to recognize "Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Day" and to advance research relating to peripartum cardiomyopathy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating February 16, 2009, as "Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania; and urging the National Institutes of Health to recognize "Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Day" and to advance research relating to peripartum cardiomyopathy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-09 - House - HR 9 PN 343 (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-09 Adopted
2009-02-10 Reported as amended
2009-01-27 Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback