PA HR898 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-18)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Adopted (192-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-18)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Adopted (192-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing May 25, 2016, as "National Missing Children's Day" in Pennsylvania and urging participation in child protection.
Title
Recognizing May 25, 2016, as "National Missing Children's Day" in Pennsylvania and urging participation in child protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Adopted (192-0) |
2016-05-19 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |