PA HR871 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-14)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution observing June 19, 2018, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in Pennsylvania in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery was abolished finally in all regions of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Observing June 19, 2018, as "Juneteenth Independence Day" in Pennsylvania in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which slavery was abolished finally in all regions of the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseAdopted (197-0)
2018-04-26HouseINTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback