PA HR858 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of May 2020 as "Mental Health Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of May 2020 as "Mental Health Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |