PA HR836 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-02 - Motion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained Sept. 2, 2020 (118-84)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution terminating the March 6, 2020, Proclamation of Disaster Emergency issued under the hand and Seal of the Governor, Thomas Westerman Wolf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution terminating the March 6, 2020, Proclamation of Disaster Emergency issued under the hand and Seal of the Governor, Thomas Westerman Wolf.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HR 836 PN 3910, MOT OVERRIDE, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 118 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 836 PN 3910 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 836 PN 3903, A6139, CORMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-6139 RECONSIDERED (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HR 836 PN 3910, CONCUR (Y: 121 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HR 836 PN 3881 (Y: 117 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: HR 836 PN 3828, 2019 A5949, CUTLER (Y: 119 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A05810 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05825 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05824 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05823 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05822 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A05810 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-02SenateMotion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained Sept. 2, 2020 (118-84)
2020-07-14SenateIn the House
2020-07-14HouseVeto No. 10
2020-07-14HouseVetoed by the Governor
2020-07-08HousePresented to the Governor
2020-06-10HouseSigned in Senate
2020-06-09HouseSigned in House
2020-06-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (121-81)
2020-06-09HouseIn the House
2020-06-09SenateAdopted (31-19)
2020-06-09SenateAmended (46-4)
2020-06-08SenateReported as amended
2020-06-04SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2020-05-28SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-28HouseAmended and Adopted
2020-05-26HouseReported as amended
2020-04-03HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=836
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0836&pn=3521
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0836&pn=3828
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0836&pn=3881
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0836&pn=3903
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0836&pn=3910
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/21/2020&RollCallId=2059
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/21/2020&RollCallId=2060
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/21/2020&RollCallId=2061
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/21/2020&RollCallId=2062
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/21/2020&RollCallId=2063
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/21/2020&RollCallId=2064
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1388
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1389
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/08/2020&RollCallId=929
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=516
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=521
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1575

Bill Comments

feedback