PA HR806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution requesting that the President and the Congress of the United States recognize naturalized Korean Americans who served during the Vietnam Conflict as veterans of the armed forces of the United States, making these individuals eligible for benefits through the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Requesting that the President and the Congress of the United States recognize naturalized Korean Americans who served during the Vietnam Conflict as veterans of the armed forces of the United States, making these individuals eligible for benefits through the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |