PA HR796 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the week of May 17 through 23, 2020, as "Emergency Medical Services Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the week of May 17 through 23, 2020, as "Emergency Medical Services Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HR 796 PN 3406 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |