PA HR782 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of March 2020 as "Youth Art Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of March 2020 as "Youth Art Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-01 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |