PA HR760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution declaring that the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania is committed to equal rights for individuals with cognitive disabilities to technology and information access and calling for implementation of these rights with deliberate speed.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution declaring that the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania is committed to equal rights for individuals with cognitive disabilities to technology and information access and calling for implementation of these rights with deliberate speed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-16 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |