PA HR76 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on October 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-16 - Adopted (48-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on October 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-16 - Adopted (48-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution declaring that the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania is opposed to the enactment and enforcement of a State law, under a Federal mandate, that requires the suspension or revocation, or the delay of issuance or reinstatement, of the driver's license of an individual convicted of a violation of the Controlled Substances Act or another drug offense; urging the Governor to submit a written certification stating the Governor's opposition to the State law along with this resolution to the United States Secretary of Transportation; and accordingly preventing the United States Secretary of Transportation from withholding a specified percentage of Federal transportation apportionments under 23 U.S.C. 159.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution declaring that the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania is opposed to the enactment and enforcement of a State law, under a Federal mandate, that requires the suspension or revocation, or the delay of issuance or reinstatement, of the driver's license of an individual convicted of a violation of the Controlled Substances Act or another drug offense; urging the Governor to submit a written certification stating the Governor's opposition to the State law along with this resolution to the United States Secretary of Transportation; and accordingly preventing the United States Secretary of Transportation from withholding a specified percentage of Federal transportation apportionments under 23 U.S.C. 159.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HR 76 PN 427 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HR 76 PN 427 (Y: 189 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HR 76 PN 427 (Y: 189 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-16 | Senate | Adopted (48-1) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Adopted (189-3) |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |