PA HR742 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of May 2020 as "Motorcycle Safety and Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of May 2020 as "Motorcycle Safety and Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |