PA HR74 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-10)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study and issue a report on the current status, management and benefits of conservation corridors in this Commonwealth.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study and issue a report on the current status, management and benefits of conservation corridors in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | House | Re-referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-11-10 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |