PA HR74 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution declaring that the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania is committed to equal rights for individuals with cognitive disabilities to technology and information access and calling for implementation of these rights with deliberate speed.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution declaring that the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania is committed to equal rights for individuals with cognitive disabilities to technology and information access and calling for implementation of these rights with deliberate speed.
Sponsors
Rep. Angel Cruz [D] | Rep. Rosita Youngblood [D] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D] |
Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D] | Rep. Thomas Murt [R] | Rep. Brandon Markosek [D] | Rep. Joseph Webster [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |