PA HR729 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring the life and achievements of Dr. Noel Ignatiev and expressing condolences on his passing.
Title
Honoring the life and achievements of Dr. Noel Ignatiev and expressing condolences on his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HR 729 PN 3285 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Adopted (200-0) |
2020-08-31 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-31 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |