PA HR720 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of March 2020 as "National Nutrition Month" in Pennsylvania as sponsored by the Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics.
Title
Recognizing the month of March 2020 as "National Nutrition Month" in Pennsylvania as sponsored by the Academy of Nutrition and Dietetics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to HEALTH |