PA HR713 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the week of March 8 through 15, 2020, as "AmeriCorps Week" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the week of March 8 through 15, 2020, as "AmeriCorps Week" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HR 713 PN 3250 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |