PA HR683 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating January 26, 2020, as "Kawasaki Disease Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating January 26, 2020, as "Kawasaki Disease Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HR 683 PN 3191 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to HEALTH |