PA HR658 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Adopted (187-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing January 27, 2020, as "International Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing January 27, 2020, as "International Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HR 658 PN 3115 (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22HouseAdopted (187-0)
2020-01-14HouseReported as committed
2020-01-13HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback