PA HR654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Adopted (195-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing February 25, 2020, as "World Spay Day" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing February 25, 2020, as "World Spay Day" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HR 654 PN 3089 (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03HouseAdopted (195-0)
2020-01-14HouseReported as committed
2020-01-10HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback