PA HR647 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of February 2020 as "Esports Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of February 2020 as "Esports Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-02 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-18 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |