PA HR641 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution designating January 23, 2020, as "Maternal Health Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania to recognize all the women who die from complications of pregnancy or childbirth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating January 23, 2020, as "Maternal Health Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania to recognize all the women who die from complications of pregnancy or childbirth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HR 641 PN 3022 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseAdopted (196-0)
2020-01-22HouseReported as committed
2019-12-16HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback