PA HR639 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Adopted (197-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating December 18, 2019, as "Second Gulf War Veterans Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating December 18, 2019, as "Second Gulf War Veterans Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HR 639 PN 3015 (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | House | Adopted (197-0) |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |