PA HR629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on January 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution honoring the legacy of longtime WHTM/ABC27 director Gregory D. Mace, 65, of Camp Hill, who passed away November 23, 2019.
Title
Honoring the legacy of longtime WHTM/ABC27 director Gregory D. Mace, 65, of Camp Hill, who passed away November 23, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HR 629 PN 3008 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |