PA HR629 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-13)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-26 - Re-committed to RULES
Status: Introduced on March 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-26 - Re-committed to RULES
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the lack of due process in the 1876-1878 trials of several alleged members of the Molly Maguires and memorializing the Governor to issue an order acknowledging the same.
Title
A Resolution recognizing the lack of due process in the 1876-1878 trials of several alleged members of the Molly Maguires and memorializing the Governor to issue an order acknowledging the same.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-26 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2008-06-03 | Removed from table | |
2008-06-03 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-18 | Reported as committed | |
2008-03-10 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=629 |