PA HR618 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Amended and Adopted (192-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing the month of January 2020 as "National Human Trafficking Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the month of January 2020 as "National Human Trafficking Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HR 618 PN 3196 (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HR 618 PN 2946, 2019 A4500, TOOHIL (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseAmended and Adopted (192-0)
2020-01-14HouseReported as committed
2019-11-22HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=618
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0618&pn=2946
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=R&billNbr=0618&pn=3196
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/14/2020&RollCallId=1578
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1069
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1070

Bill Comments

feedback