PA HR576 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of November 2019 as "Assistive Technology Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of November 2019 as "Assistive Technology Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Murt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |