PA HR540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing October 7, 2019, as "Blue Shirt Day World Day of Bullying Prevention" in Pennsylvania in support of those working hard to raise awareness of bullying and preventing its occurrence.
Title
Recognizing October 7, 2019, as "Blue Shirt Day World Day of Bullying Prevention" in Pennsylvania in support of those working hard to raise awareness of bullying and preventing its occurrence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HR 540 PN 2626 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-30 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |