PA HR54 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Passed on February 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Adopted (194-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing February 4, 2019, as "National Thank a Mail Carrier Day" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing February 4, 2019, as "National Thank a Mail Carrier Day" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - House Floor: UNCONTESTED CALENDAR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseAdopted (194-0)
2019-02-01HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 274
2019-01-29HouseINTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback