PA HR533 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing the month of October 2019 as "National Disability Employment Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the month of October 2019 as "National Disability Employment Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-22 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseRemoved from table
2020-10-26HouseLaid on the table
2020-08-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-08-28HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-20HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-14HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-13HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-22HouseReported as committed
2019-09-26HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback