PA HR522 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3-1)
Status: Passed on December 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution urging the Treasurer of Pennsylvania to petition the Federal Reserve to remit $24 billion to the Commonwealth to reimburse State and municipal pension plans for lost earnings due to quantitative easing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution urging the Treasurer of Pennsylvania to petition the Federal Reserve to remit $24 billion to the Commonwealth to reimburse State and municipal pension plans for lost earnings due to quantitative easing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HR 522 PN 2487 (Y: 126 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-02SenateReferred to FINANCE
2017-12-11SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-11HouseAdopted (126-61)
2017-10-17HouseReported as committed
2017-09-27HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback