PA HR475 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-23)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Adopted (187-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing September 11, 2017, as the 16th anniversary of the September 11, 2001, Al Qaeda attacks on our nation and honoring the sacrifices of the victims and first responders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing September 11, 2017, as the 16th anniversary of the September 11, 2001, Al Qaeda attacks on our nation and honoring the sacrifices of the victims and first responders.

Sponsors

Rep. Carl Metzgar [R]Rep. Rich Irvin [R]Rep. Frank Burns [D]Rep. Alexander Charlton [R]
Rep. Gary Day [R]Rep. Greg Rothman [R]Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D]Rep. Rebecca Corbin [R]
Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. Melinda Fee [R]Rep. Matthew Baker [R]
Rep. Gene DiGirolamo [R]Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]
Rep. Karen Boback [R]Rep. Cris Dush [R]Rep. Tarah Toohil [R]Rep. Curtis Sonney [R]
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Frank Dermody [D]Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D]
Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]Rep. Will Tallman [R]
Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]Rep. Marcia Hahn [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]
Rep. Jared Solomon [D]Rep. Mark Longietti [D]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]Rep. Daniel Deasy [D]
Rep. Bernie O'Neill [R]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Michael Reese [R]Rep. Bryan Barbin [D]Rep. David Reed [R]
Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Martin Causer [R]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]
Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]
Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Ron Marsico [R]Rep. Emilio Vazquez [D]Rep. Thomas Murt [R]
Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Katharine Watson [R]Rep. Jim Cox [R]Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]
Rep. Scott Petri [R]Rep. Bradley Roae [R]Rep. James Santora [R]Rep. Joanna McClinton [D]
Rep. Jason Dawkins [D]Rep. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R]Rep. Neal Goodman [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]
Rep. Dominic Costa [D]

Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - House - House Floor: HR 475 PN 2371 (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11HouseAdopted (187-0)
2017-09-06HouseINTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback