PA HR460 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-16)
Status: Passed on January 15 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-01-22 - Referred to EDUCATION
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-16)
Status: Passed on January 15 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-01-22 - Referred to EDUCATION
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the Joint Legislative Commission on Public School Finance and providing for the powers and duties of the commission.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the Joint Legislative Commission on Public School Finance and providing for the powers and duties of the commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-22 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2008-01-15 | Adopted | |
2007-12-12 | Reported as amended | |
2007-10-18 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=460 |