PA HR424 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on November 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Adopted (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution recognizing the 30th anniversary of the Tiananmen Square protests that began on June 4, 1989, and the events that occurred that day, along with the heroism of the participants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the 30th anniversary of the Tiananmen Square protests that began on June 4, 1989, and the events that occurred that day, along with the heroism of the participants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: HR 424 PN 2250 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19HouseAdopted (198-0)
2019-10-23HouseReported as committed
2019-09-23HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-06-25HouseINTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback