PA HR424 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-17 - Adopted (198-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-17 - Adopted (198-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution memorializing Congress to examine existing Federal laws relating to sober living arrangements.
Title
Memorializing Congress to examine existing Federal laws relating to sober living arrangements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HR 424 PN 2278 (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03416 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03416 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03416 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03416 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Adopted (198-1) |
2015-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-07-20 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |